Chhattisgarh ias list
WebMay 25, 1998 · GOVERNMENT OF CHHATTISGARH; Search Search. Social Media Links. Site Map; Accessibility Links. A+ Font Size Increase; A Normal Font - Selected; ... Shri Ramanand Shukla,(IAS) 25-05-1998: 04-06-1999 . Website Policies; Help; Contact Us; Feedback; Content Owned by District Administration WebChhattisgarh government on Saturday transferred 29 Indian Administrative Service (IAS) officers including nine district collectors in a major reshuffle. The transfer order by the …
Chhattisgarh ias list
Did you know?
WebNov 1, 2000 · Chhattisgarh : General Information. State Name – Chhattisgarh. Ancient name of the state - Dakshin Kosal. Establishment of the state - 1 November, 2000 (26 th state of the country) Mother State of the State - Madhya Pradesh. Chhattisgarh became a division of Madhya Pradesh in - 1862. WebJun 13, 2024 · 30 IAS Transfer in Chhattisgarh Govt. RECAP Major Administrative Reshuffle of 30 IAS in Chhattisgarh- see full list The Baghel Govt in Chhattisgarh has reshuffled 30 Indian Administrative Service (IAS) Officers across the state with Topeshwar Verma IAS (2005) presently Collector- Rajnandgaon being posted as Secretary- Food, …
WebJun 28, 2024 · Details. Shri. Chandan Kumar (IAS) Collector & District Magistrate Bastar. Educational Qualification :- M.A. (Hons) Date of Joining as District Collector Bastar :- 28-06-2024. Allotment Year Cadre & Domicile :- 2011, Chhattisgarh , Bihar. WebAug 1, 2024 · Haryana: 9 IAS Officers Transferred, IAS Phoolchand Meena Appointed As the Commissioner of Gurugram Corp, IAS Yashendra Singh Will Be the New Transport …
WebDec 8, 2024 · The list of best IAS coaching institutes in Chhattisgarh provided here is aimed to provide a comprehensive guide to the aspirants who are looking to pursue their IAS dreams from the state. It is always wise to consult with multiple sources and do your own research before settling on one coaching institute. Web1 day ago · BENGALURU: IAS officer Akash Shankar, working as chief executive officer of Kodagu zilla panchayat at present, his parents and brother have been booked on dowry harassment charges.
WebIAS Officers' IPR Information System. Accountant General, C.G. SPARROW (eAPAR) SPARROW User Manual. Site Designed, developed and hosted by National Informatics …
WebSep 15, 2024 · Of these, the highest number of 72 lakh 31 thousand 82 are living in rural areas. The Union Cabinet chaired by the Prime Minister has agreed to include 12 communities of Chhattisgarh in the Scheduled Tribes. They are as follows: Reformation of the English version of the name Bhuyan Bharia as Bharia without any change. faire pied de page wordWebNov 2, 2024 · A 2009 batch IAS officer Sameer Vishnoi and businessmen Sunil Agrawal and Laxmikant Tiwari were remanded to 14-day judicial custody by a special (PMLA) court in Raipur on October 27 as they were ... dog stool is blackWebSep 13, 2024 · Chhattisgarh: 20 IAS, 2 IPS and several state administrative service officers transferred. Addl Chief Secretary Subrat Kumar Sahoo has been relieved from the … faire partition windows 10WebChhattisgarh, a state of India, has 33 administrative districts.At the time of separation from Madhya Pradesh, Chhattisgarh originally had 16 districts.Two new districts: Bijapur and … dog stool sample test costWebApr 3, 2024 · This explains why West Bengal has given the lesser number of IAS officers despite a high population. IAS Toppers and Their Home States. The list below mentions the names of the UPSC Toppers list along with their home states, from 2014 to 2024: UPSC 2024 – AIR 1 Pradeep Singh – Haryana; UPSC 2024 – AIR 1 Kanishka Kataria – Rajasthan dog stool is yellow and softWebMar 28, 2024 · Collector; Name Designation Address Phone; Dr.(Ms.) Priyanka Shukla IAS: Collector Kanker: Collector Office, Near Bus Stand, Kanker, Chhattisgarh, Pin 494334 dogs toothacheWebJun 6, 2024 · 30 IAS Transfer in Chhattisgarh Govt. Major Rejig in Chhattisgarh – 30 IAS Reshuffled , Indian Bureaucracy Exclusive The Bhupesh Baghel Govt has shifted 30 IAS Officers across the state with immediate effect, the names of the officers are :. Shri Topeshwar Verma IAS (2005) presently Collector- Rajnandgaon transferred as Secretary … faire part mariage word